IA HF2020 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 351.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 351.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the Terrace Hill commission to establish an endowment fund for musical arts to support piano competitions and scholarships. (See HF 2200.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the Terrace Hill commission to establish an endowment fund for musical arts to support piano competitions and scholarships. (See HF 2200.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 351. |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-16 | House | Subcommittee: Pettengill, Koester and Winckler. H.J. 104. |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 85. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2200 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 752.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2020 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2020.html |