IA HF2014 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to weapons requirements for nonambulatory hunters. (See HF 2250.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to weapons requirements for nonambulatory hunters. (See HF 2250.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Cownie, Breckenridge and Huseman. H.J. 97. |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 71. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2250 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 594.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2014 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2014.html |