IA HF2007 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to antique vehicle special registration plates.(See HF 2251.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to antique vehicle special registration plates.(See HF 2251.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Hite [R] | Rep. Brian Lohse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2251. |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 164. |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 1:00PM RM 304. |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Gerhold, Hansen and Siegrist. H.J. 50. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 29. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2251 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2007 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2007.html |