IA HF2001 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting dance school and dance studio services from the sales and use tax.
Title
A bill for an act exempting dance school and dance studio services from the sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Mohr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-03-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2022 8:30AM House Lounge 2. |
2022-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Gjerde and Jones. H.J. 67. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 29. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2001 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2001.html |