IA HF200 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 293.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 293.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to single-trip permits for vehicles of excessive size and weight during special or emergency situations.(Formerly HSB 46.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to single-trip permits for vehicles of excessive size and weight during special or emergency situations.(Formerly HSB 46.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 293. |
2023-02-09 | House | SF 153 substituted. H.J. 292. |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 247. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB46 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 200.
SSB1061 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 153.
SF153 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 354.
SSB1061 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 153.
SF153 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 354.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF200 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF200.html |