IA HF200 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the military code and duty performed by a member of the United States coast guard. (Formerly HSB 43.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the military code and duty performed by a member of the United States coast guard. (Formerly HSB 43.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 645. |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 645. |
2021-02-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 293. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 240. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 237. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Substituted for SF 182. S.J. 237. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 182. S.J. 181. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 181. |
2021-01-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 221. |
2021-01-27 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays none. H.J. 215. |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 188. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB43 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 200.
SSB1043 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 182.
SF182 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 238.
SSB1043 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 182.
SF182 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 238.