IA HF198 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 620.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to sales tax rebates for a raceway facility.(See HF 660.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to sales tax rebates for a raceway facility.(See HF 660.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 620.
2023-03-07HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 660.
2023-03-07HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 541.
2023-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-02-22HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 12:30PM House Lounge 2.
2023-02-21HouseSubcommittee: Boden, Kniff McCulla and Kurth. H.J. 381.
2023-02-06HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 246.

Same As/Similar To

HF660 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback