IA HF192 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child sexual abuse and child sexual assault awareness and prevention.(See HF 414.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to child sexual abuse and child sexual assault awareness and prevention.(See HF 414.)
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Mohr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 414. |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 300. |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee: Kerr, Anderson and Gobble. H.J. 202. |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 186. |
Same As/Similar To
HF414 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 964.
SF270 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 2:00PM 217 Conference Room.
SF270 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 2:00PM 217 Conference Room.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF192 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF192.html |