IA HF190 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to cross-over visitation between residents or tenants in a shared campus long-term care facility during a national public health emergency or public health disaster.
Title
A bill for an act relating to cross-over visitation between residents or tenants in a shared campus long-term care facility during a national public health emergency or public health disaster.
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Fry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 12:30PM RM 15. |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Brown-Powers and Meyer, A.. H.J. 196. |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 186. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF190 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF190.html |