IA HF167 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to voter registration and voting by lowering the age at which a person may register to vote and the age at which a registered voter is eligible to vote in a primary election and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to voter registration and voting by lowering the age at which a person may register to vote and the age at which a registered voter is eligible to vote in a primary election and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Moore and Steckman. H.J. 305. |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 165. |
Same As/Similar To
SF61 (Similar To) 2017-01-19 - Subcommittee: Smith, Bisignano, and Chapman. S.J. 107.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF167 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF167.html |