IA HF163 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying sex offender registry requirements by requiring sex offenders whose registration requirements have expired to reregister, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act modifying sex offender registry requirements by requiring sex offenders whose registration requirements have expired to reregister, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-16 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Fisher, Baudler and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 104. |
2017-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Wessel-Kroeschell and Wheeler. H.J. 236. |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 164. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF163 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF163.html |