IA HF161 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to damage awards against health care providers, creating a medical error task force, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 102.) Effective date: 02/16/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 02/16/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to damage awards against health care providers, creating a medical error task force, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 102.) Effective date: 02/16/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 02/16/2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-08 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1014, as amended? (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Shall amendment H–1014, as amended, be adopted? (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1014? (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1007, as amended? (Y: 38 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Shall amendment H–1014, as amended, be adopted? (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Shall amendment H–1002, as amended, be adopted? (Y: 24 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12HouseFiscal note.
2023-02-16HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 373.
2023-02-15HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 356.
2023-02-09HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 280.
2023-02-08SenateImmediate message. S.J. 288.
2023-02-15SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 344.
2023-02-08SenatePassed Senate, yeas 29, nays 20. S.J. 288.
2023-02-08SenateSubstituted for SF 148. S.J. 287.
2023-02-08SenateAttached to SF 148. S.J. 287.
2023-02-08SenateMessage from House. S.J. 287.
2023-02-08HouseImmediate message. H.J. 274.
2023-02-08HousePoint of order raised pursuant to Art. III, Sect. 29, Const. of Iowa. B. Meyer object to title; ruled point not well taken. H.J. 274.
2023-02-08HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 274.
2023-02-08HousePassed House, yeas 54, nays 46. H.J. 273.
2023-02-08HouseAmendment H-1014, yeas 53, nays 45, adopted, as amended. H.J. 272.
2023-02-08HouseMotion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 271.
2023-02-08HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1014, as amended, yeas 58, nays 41. H.J. 271.
2023-02-08HousePoint of order raised on amendment H-1014, as amended, ruled not germane. H.J. 270.
2023-02-08HouseAmendment H-1015 to amendment H-1014 adopted. H.J. 270.
2023-02-08HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 270.
2023-02-08HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1007, as amended, yeas 38, nays 61. H.J. 269.
2023-02-08HousePoint of order raised on amendment H-1007, as amended, ruled not germane. H.J. 269.
2023-02-08HouseAmendment H-1013 to amendment H-1007 adopted. H.J. 269.
2023-02-08HouseAmendment H-1002, as amended, yeas 24, nays 75, lost. H.J. 268.
2023-02-08HouseAmendment H-1017 to amendment H-1002 filed, adopted. H.J. 268.
2023-02-08HouseAmendment H-1004 to amendment H-1002 withdrawn. H.J. 267.
2023-02-08HouseAmendment H-1003 to amendment H-1002 withdrawn. H.J. 267.
2023-02-07HouseAmendments H-1013, H-1014 and H-1015 filed. H.J. 263.
2023-02-07HouseFiscal note.
2023-02-02HouseAmendment H-1007 filed. H.J. 244.
2023-02-01HouseAmendment H-1004 filed. H.J. 232.
2023-01-31HouseAmendment H-1003 filed. H.J. 213.
2023-01-30HouseAmendment H-1002 filed. H.J. 209.
2023-01-30HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 205.

Same As/Similar To

HF102 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 274.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF161
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF161.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/90/attachments/HF161.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/90/attachments/HF161.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1368413.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1371828.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230208_HJNL.pdf#268
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230208_HJNL.pdf#271
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230208_HJNL.pdf#273
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230208_SJNL.pdf#288
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230208_HJNL.pdf#269
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230208_HJNL.pdf#270
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230208_HJNL.pdf#272
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#288

Bill Comments

feedback