IA HF161 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention.
Title
A bill for an act relating to child sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Kinney, and Zaun. S.J. 800. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 777. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 777. |
2017-03-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2017-03-28 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 803. |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0. H.J. 774. |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1236 adopted. H.J. 773. |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment H-1236 filed. H.J. 767. |
2017-03-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 485. |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Heartsill, Carlin and Lensing. H.J. 176. |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 164. |