IA HF157 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a nurse preceptor tax credit available against the individual income tax, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act creating a nurse preceptor tax credit available against the individual income tax, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2023-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Best and Wilson. H.J. 275. |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 204. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF157 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF157.html |