IA HF157 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee reassigned: Salmon, Smith, M. and Sorensen. H.J. 151.
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee reassigned: Salmon, Smith, M. and Sorensen. H.J. 151.
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a veterans recovery pilot program and fund for the reimbursement of expenses related to providing hyperbaric oxygen treatment to eligible veterans.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a veterans recovery pilot program and fund for the reimbursement of expenses related to providing hyperbaric oxygen treatment to eligible veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Salmon, Smith, M. and Sorensen. H.J. 151. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Smith, M. and Sorensen. H.J. 195. |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 176. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1127 (Related) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF529 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF529 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF157 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF157.html |