IA HF156 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing a property tax exemption for land used to produce food within the limits of a city.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing a property tax exemption for land used to produce food within the limits of a city.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-03-28HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2023 12:30PM House Lounge.
2023-03-28HouseSubcommittee: Sexton, Deyoe and Isenhart. H.J. 740.
2023-01-30HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 204.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback