IA HF146 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned: Upmeyer, Dolecheck and Hunter. H.J. 121.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned: Upmeyer, Dolecheck and Hunter. H.J. 121.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to wage discrimination under the Iowa civil rights Act of 1965 and in state contracting, making penalties applicable, and establishing an equal pay task force.
Title
A bill for an act relating to wage discrimination under the Iowa civil rights Act of 1965 and in state contracting, making penalties applicable, and establishing an equal pay task force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Upmeyer, Dolecheck and Hunter. H.J. 121. |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Grassley, Dolecheck and Hunter. H.J. 194. |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Labor. H.J. 159. |
Same As/Similar To
SF242 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Carlin, and Dotzler. S.J. 301.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF146 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF146.html |