IA HF146 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to notice requirements for actions for forcible entry and detainer. Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to notice requirements for actions for forcible entry and detainer. Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 954. |
2017-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 960. |
2017-04-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 937. |
2017-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1305. H.J. 936. |
2017-04-05 | House | Senate amendment H-1305 filed. H.J. 898. |
2017-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 896. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 895. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 894. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amendment S-3270 adopted. S.J. 894. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amendment S-3270 filed. S.J. 854. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 854. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Bisignano, et al. S.J. 829. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Boulton, and Shipley. S.J. 720. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 685. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 685. |
2017-03-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 695. |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 1. H.J. 693. |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee amendment H-1110 adopted, as amended. H.J. 692. |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment H-1200 to H-1110 adopted. H.J. 692. |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment H-1200 filed. H.J. 668. |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee amendment H-1110 filed. H.J. 473. |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 472. |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Bennett and Gustafson. H.J. 176. |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 151. |