IA HF141 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the military service property tax exemption and credit and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 22.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the military service property tax exemption and credit and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 22.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 195. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB22 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF141.
SSB1138 (Related) 2023-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 280.
SF280 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Fiscal note.
SSB1138 (Related) 2023-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 280.
SF280 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Fiscal note.