IA HF14 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the minimum age for employment of persons by a retail alcohol licensee.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the minimum age for employment of persons by a retail alcohol licensee.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2023 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Forbes and Lundgren. H.J. 96. |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 74. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF14 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF14.html |