IA HF139 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 698.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing the cybersecurity simulation training center at the Iowa state university of science and technology, and making appropriations.(Formerly HSB 14; See HF 698.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing the cybersecurity simulation training center at the Iowa state university of science and technology, and making appropriations.(Formerly HSB 14; See HF 698.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-10HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 698.
2023-04-05HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 777.
2023-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-02-01HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 11:30AM RM 304.
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee: Sorensen, Nordman and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 211.
2023-01-26HouseIntroduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 195.

Same As/Similar To

HSB14 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 139.
HF698 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Appropriations. H.J. 1030.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback