IA HF124 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa educational savings plan trust by modifying the deduction of contributions from the individual income tax and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 63)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa educational savings plan trust by modifying the deduction of contributions from the individual income tax and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 63)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Hogg, and Smith. S.J. 313. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 256. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 256. |
2015-02-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 293. |
2015-02-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 295. |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 1. H.J. 291. |
2015-02-16 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 181. |