IA HF119 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 673.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 673.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the criminal offense of assault on a pregnant person, and providing penalties.(See HF 570.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the criminal offense of assault on a pregnant person, and providing penalties.(See HF 570.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 673. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 570. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 448. |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Shipley, Fry and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 211. |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 183. |
Same As/Similar To
HF570 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF119 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF119.html |