IA HF118 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Klein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 313.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Klein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 313.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to carrying and possessing weapons and acquiring pistols and revolvers, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to carrying and possessing weapons and acquiring pistols and revolvers, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee: Windschitl, Klein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 313. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 145. |
Same As/Similar To
SF165 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2019 11:00AM RM 116.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF118 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF118.html |