IA HF11 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to support of a child including support relative to the child's completion of high school graduation or equivalency requirements.(See HF 416.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to support of a child including support relative to the child's completion of high school graduation or equivalency requirements.(See HF 416.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Hite [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 416. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 11:30AM Law Library. |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Osmundson and Wolfe. H.J. 107. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 50. |
Same As/Similar To
HF416 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 622.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF11 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF11.html |