IA HF101 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 725.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the inclusion of the telephone and text numbers for the your life Iowa program on public school student identification cards and including applicability provisions.(See HF 602.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the inclusion of the telephone and text numbers for the your life Iowa program on public school student identification cards and including applicability provisions.(See HF 602.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 725.
2023-03-03HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 602.
2023-03-01HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 486.
2023-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-01-30HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 11:30AM House Lounge.
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee: Sorensen, Collins and Kurth. H.J. 187.
2023-01-24HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 176.

Same As/Similar To

HF602 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1041.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback