HI SR94 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The University Of Hawaii, In Conjunction With The Department Of Public Safety And Department Of Land And Natural Resources Division Of Conservation And Resources Enforcement, To Strengthen And Enhance The School-to-career Pipeline For Positions In Public Safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The University Of Hawaii, In Conjunction With The Department Of Public Safety And Department Of Land And Natural Resources Division Of Conservation And Resources Enforcement, To Strengthen And Enhance The School-to-career Pipeline For Positions In Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-11SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-19.
2019-04-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2077) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from HRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1548), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback