HI SR92 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Governor To Nominate Opportunity Zones To Assist With Economic Development In Census Tracts In Wahiawa And Whitmore Village.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Governor To Nominate Opportunity Zones To Assist With Economic Development In Census Tracts In Wahiawa And Whitmore Village.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1707) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to EET.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback