HI SR92 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Federal Bureau Of Investigation To Report Crimes Of Domestic Violence Under The Uniform Crime Reporting System.
Title
Uniform Crime Reporting; Domestic Violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-15. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1270) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=92&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SR92_.HTM |