HI SR83 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR83
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Executive Office On Aging Update The 2013 White Paper On Active Aging And Provide A Final Report On Its Updated Version No Later Than The Start Of The Regular Session Of 2021.
Title
Requesting That The Executive Office On Aging Update The 2013 White Paper On Active Aging And Provide A Final Report On Its Updated Version No Later Than The Start Of The Regular Session Of 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR83 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
HR188 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR188 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).