HI SR83 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR83
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to TRE/PSM/AEN.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to TRE/PSM/AEN.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And City And County Of Honolulu To Implement Safeguards At Hauula Beach Park To Protect Hawaiian Monk Seals.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And City And County Of Honolulu To Implement Safeguards At Hauula Beach Park To Protect Hawaiian Monk Seals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM/AEN. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR83 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR74 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR74 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=83&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR83_.HTM |