HI SR83 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR83
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Task Force Established To Study Effective Incarceration Policies To Improve Hawaii's Correctional System, Also Identify In Its Final Report Sites For A New Correctional Facility That Are Ten Acres Or Less In Size.
Title
Requesting The Task Force Established To Study Effective Incarceration Policies To Improve Hawaii's Correctional System, Also Identify In Its Final Report Sites For A New Correctional Facility That Are Ten Acres Or Less In Size.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1438) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR83 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.