HI SR81 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Office Of Information Practices To Explore A Trial Preliminary Inclination Process For Incoming Public Appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Office Of Information Practices To Explore A Trial Preliminary Inclination Process For Incoming Public Appeals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586), with recommendation of referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback