HI SR8 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The National Conference Of State Legislatures And Council Of State Governments To Update The Findings Of The 2004 Joint Project On Term Limits On The Potential Positive And Negative Consequences Of Implementing Term Limits For Members Of The Legislature.
Title
Requesting The National Conference Of State Legislatures And Council Of State Governments To Update The Findings Of The 2004 Joint Project On Term Limits On The Potential Positive And Negative Consequences Of Implementing Term Limits For Members Of The Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1548) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR10 (Same As) 2023-04-11 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 28