HI SR79 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR79
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to JDC/GVO.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to JDC/GVO.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Judiciary To Partner With Supporting Agencies And Request Grant Funds Under The Victims Of Crime Act To Establish And Support A Restorative Justice Program In Each County To Allow Victims And Offenders An Opportunity To Participate In Restorative Justice.
Title
Urging The Judiciary To Partner With Supporting Agencies And Request Grant Funds Under The Victims Of Crime Act To Establish And Support A Restorative Justice Program In Each County To Allow Victims And Offenders An Opportunity To Participate In Restorative Justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC/GVO. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR79 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
HR143 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR89 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to JDC/GVO.
HR143 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR89 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to JDC/GVO.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=79&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SR79_.HTM |