HI SR77 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designating November As Alzheimer's And Dementia Awareness Month In The State Of Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating November As Alzheimer's And Dementia Awareness Month In The State Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1699) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-14SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to LCA/CPH.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR191 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback