HI SR71 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR71
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Consider Amending The Eligibility Qualifications And Lease Terms For Its Agricultural Lots To Aid Small Farm Businesses.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Consider Amending The Eligibility Qualifications And Lease Terms For Its Agricultural Lots To Aid Small Farm Businesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR71 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR92 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR92 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).