HI SR71 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Implement An Incentive Program To Promote The Purchase Of Hawaii-grown Agricultural Commodities.
Title
Department of Agriculture; Hawaii-Grown Agricultural Commodities; Incentive Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3415) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3046), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |