HI SR7 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR7

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix In Light Of Anticipated Changes To Federal Title Ix Regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix In Light Of Anticipated Changes To Federal Title Ix Regulations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:50PM in conference room 229.
2020-01-28SenateReferred to HRE, JDC.
2020-01-21SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR7 (Carry Over) 2019-03-29 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR13 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback