HI SR69 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Prioritize Investment In Public Facilities Within Transit-oriented Development Zones And The Kalaeloa Community Development District In Any Of Its Statewide Planning Functions Or Involvement Therein.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Prioritize Investment In Public Facilities Within Transit-oriented Development Zones And The Kalaeloa Community Development District In Any Of Its Statewide Planning Functions Or Involvement Therein.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-11SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-19.
2019-04-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2071) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EET/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1579), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on EET/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to EET/TRS, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback