HI SR67 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR67
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Development Of A Collaborative Plan To Best Leverage State And County Funds To Build Affordable Housing Projects And An Exploration Of The Feasibility Of Transferring A Parcel Of Land In Kahului, Maui, To The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation.
Title
Requesting The Development Of A Collaborative Plan To Best Leverage State And County Funds To Build Affordable Housing Projects And An Exploration Of The Feasibility Of Transferring A Parcel Of Land In Kahului, Maui, To The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1450) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HOU/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Ihara. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR67 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Subjects
Affordable Housing Projects
Collaborative Plan
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Land Transfer
Collaborative Plan
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Land Transfer