HI SR65 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR65
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to HMS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to HMS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Judiciary Conduct A Study On The Necessity Of Mandatory Referrals To The Department Of Human Services For Investigation Or Intervention In All Cases Of Alleged Domestic Abuse Involving A Family Or Household Member Who Is A Minor Or Incapacitated Person.
Title
Requesting The Judiciary Conduct A Study On The Necessity Of Mandatory Referrals To The Department Of Human Services For Investigation Or Intervention In All Cases Of Alleged Domestic Abuse Involving A Family Or Household Member Who Is A Minor Or Incapacitated Person.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR65 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to AEN/WTL.
HR58 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
SCR71 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Referred to HMS, JDC.
HR58 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
SCR71 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Referred to HMS, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=65&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SR65_.HTM |