HI SR65 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging Food Service Facilities In The State That Offer A Children's Menu Of Meal Options, Or A Meal That Is Represented As A Children's Meal, To Serve Children's Meals With Higher Nutritional Quality And Include Only Bottled Water Or Low-fat Milk As The Default Beverage In The Meal Or Menu Option.
Title
Children's Meals; Healthy Options
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-07-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to CPN. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1257), with recommendation of referral to CPN. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=65&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SR65_.HTM |