HI SR58 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting All Public Elementary, Intermediate, And Middle Schools In The State To Participate In The Safe Routes To School Program Established Pursuant To Section 291c-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, For Keiki Health Benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting All Public Elementary, Intermediate, And Middle Schools In The State To Participate In The Safe Routes To School Program Established Pursuant To Section 291c-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, For Keiki Health Benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-11SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-19.
2019-04-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2098) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1627), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback