HI SR57 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR57
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education, Department Of Health, Department Of Human Services, Department Of The Attorney General, And Judiciary To Incorporate Research And Strategies Regarding Adverse Childhood Experiences Into Their Work With Children Suffering From Trauma.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Education, Department Of Health, Department Of Human Services, Department Of The Attorney General, And Judiciary To Incorporate Research And Strategies Regarding Adverse Childhood Experiences Into Their Work With Children Suffering From Trauma.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported from HMS/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-30-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDL. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR57 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR82 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT/HUS, EDN/JUD, referral sheet 30
HR82 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT/HUS, EDN/JUD, referral sheet 30