HI SR57 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Paid Family Leave Task Force To Examine The Benefits And Costs Of A Potential Paid Family Leave Program In Hawaii.
Title
Paid Family Leave; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3420) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from JDL/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3222), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-23-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara, Slom. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |