HI SR55 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Prioritize Funding To Widen Kuakini Highway Between Henry Street And Kamehameha Iii Road On Hawaii Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Prioritize Funding To Widen Kuakini Highway Between Henry Street And Kamehameha Iii Road On Hawaii Island.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:05PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to TRS, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback