HI SR52 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Agency And Community Stakeholders To Continue Meeting As A Working Group For Sexual Violence Prevention Education In Public Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Agency And Community Stakeholders To Continue Meeting As A Working Group For Sexual Violence Prevention Education In Public Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1805) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to JDC.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1625), with recommendation of referral to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to EDU, JDC.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback