HI SR52 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR52
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Agency And Community Stakeholders To Continue Meeting As A Working Group For Sexual Violence Prevention Education In Public Schools.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Agency And Community Stakeholders To Continue Meeting As A Working Group For Sexual Violence Prevention Education In Public Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1805) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDC. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1625), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR52 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=52&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR52_.HTM |