HI SR48 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR48
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Conduct An Independent Fiscal Audit Of All Limited Liability Corporations Created Or Controlled By The Office.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Conduct An Independent Fiscal Audit Of All Limited Liability Corporations Created Or Controlled By The Office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-19. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2094) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR48 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=48&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR48_.HTM |